Verlina Bishop, Assistant Director, Department of Health has been appointed to act as Director, Department of Health from 19th July, 2021 to 1st August, 2021 inclusive.
Graham Mawer, Cultural Liasion and Development Officer, Department of Community and Cultural Affairs has been appointed to act as Director, Department of Community and Cultural Affairs from 12th July, 2021 to 19th July, 2021 inclusive.
The Minister of Health is pleased to make the following appointments. OPTOMETRISTS AND OPTICIANS COUNCILOptometrists and Opticians Act 2008Chairman – Ms. Ami Patel
The Minister of Health is pleased to make the following appointments. BOARD OF CHIROPODISTSAllied Health Professions Act 1973Chairman – Ms. Natasha ThomasMr. Stuart McIntoshMs. Donna HendricksonMs. Natalie AdamsAlternate-Member – Mr. Matthew J. Francis
The Minister of Health is pleased to make the following appointments. PSYCHOLOGICAL PRACTITIONERS PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT COMMITTEEPsychological Practitioners Act 2018Chairman – Ms. Kae Thomas Palacio LL.BDr. Carla Bean
The Minister of Health is pleased to make the following appointments. DENTAL PROFESSIONS COMPLAINTS COMMITTEEDental Practitioners Act 1950Chairman – Ms. K. Renee Oliveira LLBDr. Jewel Landy
APPOINTMENT OF MARRIAGE OFFICERPursuant to the provisions of The Marriage Act 1944, the Minister of Home Affairs, on the 15th June 2021, licensed Bishop Roxanne G. D.
ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS ACT 2011REGULATORY AUTHORITY (GRANT OF SPECTRUM LICENCES, PERMITS AND EXEMPTED FREQUENCIES) GENERAL DETERMINATION 2020NOTICE OF INTEREST – ASSESSMENT OF DEMAND FOR HDS SPECTRUM